NE LB442 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Notice of hearing for March 03, 2021
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 3 @ 9:30 am in Room 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Create the Commission on Asian American Affairs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the Commission on Asian American Affairs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 03, 2021
2021-01-20LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback