NE LB436 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Athletic Training Practice Act
Title
Change provisions of the Athletic Training Practice Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM2157 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM499 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM2157 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Legislature - Hansen, B. AM499 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2022 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2022-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM2157 adopted |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM2157 filed |
2022-03-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER120 adopted |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER120 filed |
2022-03-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER120 |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM499 adopted |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Hansen, B. AM499 filed |
2022-02-23 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |