NE LB436 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Returned by Governor without approval on June 04, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Returned by Governor without approval on June 04, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Complete Count Committee
Title
Create the Complete Count Committee
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-4-7 (Y: 38 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Chambers MO106 failed (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1601 adopted (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Legislature - Chambers MO106 failed (Y: 1 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1601 adopted (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Legislature | Returned by Governor without approval on June 04, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-4-7 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO107 withdrawn |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO107 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO106 failed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Chambers MO106 Bracket until May 31, 2019 filed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER135 adopted |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER135 filed |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER135 |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-05-23 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1601 adopted |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM1601 filed |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1601 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Legislature's Planning priority bill |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 13, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |