NE LB428 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB570 amended into LB428 by AM566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB570 amended into LB428 by AM566
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changes provisions relating to juvenile services under the jurisdiction of the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Changes provisions relating to juvenile services under the jurisdiction of the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM1447 lost (Y: 16 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Arch AM1315 adopted (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM566 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Legislature - Arch AM810 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. AM1447 lost (Y: 16 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-13 - Legislature - Arch AM1315 adopted (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Legislature - Health and Human Services AM566 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Legislature - Arch AM810 adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB570 amended into LB428 by AM566 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB429 amended into LB428 by AM566 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB427 amended into LB428 by AM566 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB425 amended into LB428 by AM566 |
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST32 |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1447 lost |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. AM1447 filed |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Arch AM1315 adopted |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Arch AM1315 filed |
2021-05-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER61 adopted |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER61 filed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER61 |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM566 adopted |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Arch AM943 withdrawn |
2021-04-15 | Legislature | Arch AM810 adopted |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Arch AM943 filed |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | McCollister name added |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Arch AM810 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM566 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM566 |
2021-03-12 | Legislature | Health and Human Services priority bill |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |