NE LB428 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to computation of wages under the Employment Security Law
Title
Change provisions relating to computation of wages under the Employment Security Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 42-0-7 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Hansen, M. FA41 adopted (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM758 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Hansen, M. FA41 adopted (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Legislature - Business and Labor AM758 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 01, 2019 |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-04-30 | Legislature | M. Hansen explanation of vote |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2019 |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 42-0-7 |
2019-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER77 adopted |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER77 filed |
2019-04-11 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER77 |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA41 adopted |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Hansen, M. FA41 filed |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM758 adopted |
2019-04-09 | Legislature | Wayne MO40 withdrawn |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM758 filed |
2019-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM758 |
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Wayne MO40 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Business and Labor priority bill |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 18, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019 (cancel) |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 25, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |