NE LB423 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Require registration of home inspectors
Title
Require registration of home inspectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-2-6 (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM433 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Legislature - Urban Affairs AM433 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 5, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 29, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-2-6 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER47 adopted |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER47 filed |
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER47 |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-06 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM433 adopted |
2021-03-17 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM433 filed |
2021-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM433 |
2021-02-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |