NE LB423 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB544 amended into LB423 by AM1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Provisions/portions of LB544 amended into LB423 by AM1052
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to seizure of animals and the Livestock Animal Welfare Act and restrict sales and require notifications for purposes of bovine trichomoniasis prevention
Title
Change provisions relating to seizure of animals and the Livestock Animal Welfare Act and restrict sales and require notifications for purposes of bovine trichomoniasis prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB544 amended into LB423 by AM1052 |
2013-05-08 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 08, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Hadley explanation of vote |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 02, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2013-04-30 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST13 |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Schilz AM1052 adopted |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Schilz AM1052 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Schilz MO54 prevailed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Schilz MO54 Permit consideration of AM1052 filed |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Schilz AM1056 adopted |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER40 adopted |
2013-04-19 | Legislature | Schilz AM1056 filed |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER40 filed |
2013-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER40 |
2013-04-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-04 | Legislature | Agriculture AM614 adopted |
2013-03-15 | Legislature | Agriculture AM614 filed |
2013-03-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM614 |
2013-03-15 | Legislature | Agriculture priority bill |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2013-01-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |