NE LB42 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change motor vehicle provisions relating to child passenger restraint requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change motor vehicle provisions relating to child passenger restraint requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 40-2-7 (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 04, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 29, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-03-29LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 40-2-7
2018-03-20LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-03-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-03-15LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER124 adopted
2018-03-09LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER124 filed
2018-03-09LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER124
2018-03-08LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-08LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM1965 adopted
2018-02-21LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM1965 filed
2018-02-21LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1965
2018-02-20LegislatureHilkemann priority bill
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 27, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback