NE LB42 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Hadley explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Hadley explanation of vote
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change credentialing requirements for administrators of facilities for persons with head injuries
Title
Change credentialing requirements for administrators of facilities for persons with head injuries
Sponsors
Sen. Tanya Cook [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Hadley explanation of vote |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 02, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2013-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER68 adopted |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER68 filed |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER68 |
2013-04-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-19 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM268 adopted |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM268 filed |
2013-02-20 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM268 |
2013-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2013 |
2013-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |