NE LB413 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Provisions/portions of LB413 amended into LB415 by AM923
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change a retirement application timeframe for judges and Nebraska State Patrol officers as prescribed and change supplemental lump-sum cost-of-living adjustments under the Judges Retirement Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change a retirement application timeframe for judges and Nebraska State Patrol officers as prescribed and change supplemental lump-sum cost-of-living adjustments under the Judges Retirement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB413 amended into LB415 by AM923
2017-05-23LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2017-05-23LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed
2017-05-17LegislatureMotion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed
2017-03-16LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback