NE LB412 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change a tax and assessment provision under the Nebraska Housing Agency Act
Title
Change a tax and assessment provision under the Nebraska Housing Agency Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-02-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |