NE LB411 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB733 amended into LB411 by AM1379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB733 amended into LB411 by AM1379
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Name, change, and transfer provisions relating to the county civil service commission and change provisions relating to metropolitan utilities districts, county boards, elections, and political accountability and disclosure
Title
Name, change, and transfer provisions relating to the county civil service commission and change provisions relating to metropolitan utilities districts, county boards, elections, and political accountability and disclosure
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Linehan AM1577 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Brewer AM1379 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM514 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Legislature - La Grone AM647 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Linehan AM1577 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Legislature - Brewer AM1379 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Legislature - Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM514 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Legislature - La Grone AM647 adopted (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB733 amended into LB411 by AM1379 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB618 amended into LB411 by AM514 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB608 amended into LB411 by AM514 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB574 amended into LB411 by AM1379 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB522 amended into LB411 by AM1379 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB342 amended into LB411 by AM514 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB280 amended into LB411 by AM514 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB246 amended into LB411 by AM514 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB101 amended into LB411 by AM514 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB98 amended into LB411 by AM1379 |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 13, 2019 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2019-05-13 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2019-05-07 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST21 |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Linehan AM1577 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Linehan AM1577 filed |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Brewer AM1379 adopted |
2019-05-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER52 adopted |
2019-04-23 | Legislature | Brewer AM1379 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER52 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER52 |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | La Grone AM647 adopted |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | La Grone AM647 filed |
2019-03-14 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM514 adopted |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs priority bill |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM514 filed |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM514 |
2019-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |