NE LB409 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide a moratorium on construction of electric transmission lines and create the Electric Transmission Line Study Committee of the Legislature
Title
Provide a moratorium on construction of electric transmission lines and create the Electric Transmission Line Study Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-31 | Legislature | Brewer AM381 filed |
2021-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2021 |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Brewer priority bill |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |