NE LB409 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the base limitation, local effort rate, and net option funding for school districts and the learning community transition aid calculation
Title
Change the base limitation, local effort rate, and net option funding for school districts and the learning community transition aid calculation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 04, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-04 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 44-0-5 |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Baker AM1238 withdrawn |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Baker AM1238 filed |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM1236 lost |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM1236 filed |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM1163 withdrawn |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Kolowski AM1015 lost |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Kolowski AM1015 pending |
2017-04-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER60 adopted |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM1163 filed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Kolowski AM1015 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER60 filed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER60 |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Groene AM474 withdrawn |
2017-04-19 | Legislature | Education AM955 adopted |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Education AM955 filed |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM955 |
2017-03-03 | Legislature | Groene AM474 filed |
2017-02-24 | Legislature | Education priority bill |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 06, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |