NE LB408 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to compensation paid upon the death on an employee under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Title
Change provisions relating to compensation paid upon the death on an employee under the Nebraska Workers' Compensation Act
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Quick [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 04, 2019 |
2019-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37659 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB408.pdf |