NE LB407 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Create and provide duties for the Whiteclay Public Health Emergency Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create and provide duties for the Whiteclay Public Health Emergency Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 27, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 24, 2017
2017-04-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-04-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 48-0-1
2017-04-05LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-04-03LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-04-03LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER18 adopted
2017-03-13LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER18 filed
2017-03-13LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER18
2017-03-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-03-09LegislaturePansing Brooks AM528 adopted
2017-03-09LegislatureExecutive Board AM140 adopted
2017-03-07LegislaturePansing Brooks AM528 filed
2017-02-27LegislatureState-Tribal Relations priority bill
2017-02-23LegislatureExecutive Board AM140 filed
2017-02-23LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM140
2017-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback