NE LB406 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to notices of cancellation, nonrenewal, or nonpayment of premiums for insurance policies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to notices of cancellation, nonrenewal, or nonpayment of premiums for insurance policies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 12, 2017
2017-05-09LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 08, 2017
2017-05-08LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-08LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 47-0-2
2017-05-03LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2017-05-02LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-02LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER73 adopted
2017-04-24LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER73 filed
2017-04-24LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER73
2017-04-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-20LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM204 adopted
2017-02-09LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM204 filed
2017-02-09LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM204
2017-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 06, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback