NE LB4 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change mileage reimbursement and filing fees and eliminate certain notice requirements under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Title
Change mileage reimbursement and filing fees and eliminate certain notice requirements under the Tax Equalization and Review Commission Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-11-4 (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Legislature - Stinner AM1981 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Legislature - Stinner AM1981 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on February 12, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 06, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-11-4 |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA96 withdrawn |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA96 filed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2020-01-27 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Stinner AM1981 adopted |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Stinner AM893 withdrawn |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Stinner AM1981 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-05-08 | Legislature | Stinner AM893 filed |
2019-03-05 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |