NE LB399 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change the name and provisions related to the committee on Americanism
Title
Change the name and provisions related to the committee on Americanism
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-2-3 (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Slama AM727 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Vargas AM565 lost (Y: 21 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Legislature - Slama MO22 prevailed (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Legislature - Slama AM617 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Hunt AM443 lost (Y: 12 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Education AM286 adopted (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Moser FA14 adopted (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Slama MO15 prevailed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Chambers MO13 failed (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Legislature - Chambers FA12 lost (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Bolz AM365 lost (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Chambers FA11 lost (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Bolz FA10 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Chambers FA9 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Slama AM727 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Vargas AM565 lost (Y: 21 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Returned to Select File for specific amendment (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Legislature - Slama MO22 prevailed (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Legislature - Slama AM617 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Legislature - Hunt AM443 lost (Y: 12 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Education AM286 adopted (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Moser FA14 adopted (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Slama MO15 prevailed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Legislature - Chambers MO13 failed (Y: 1 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Legislature - Chambers FA12 lost (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Bolz AM365 lost (Y: 19 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Legislature - Chambers FA11 lost (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 10 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Bolz FA10 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Chambers FA9 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-2-3 |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Slama AM727 adopted |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Slama AM727 filed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Chambers MO21 withdrawn |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Chambers FA21 withdrawn |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Chambers FA20 withdrawn |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Readvanced to Final Reading |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Vargas AM565 lost |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2019-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Chambers FA21 filed |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Slama MO22 prevailed |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Slama MO22 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Slama AM617 adopted |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO21 Recommit to the Education Committee filed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers FA20 filed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Vargas AM565 filed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Slama AM617 filed |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Hunt AM443 lost |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers FA15 withdrawn |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER43 adopted |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER43 filed |
2019-02-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER43 |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Education AM286 adopted |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Moser FA14 adopted |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Slama MO15 prevailed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Slama MO15 Invoke cloture filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Chambers MO13 failed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Hunt AM443 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers FA15 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO13 pending |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO13 pending |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers MO13 Bracket until June 6, 2019 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Moser FA14 pending |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Moser FA14 filed |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers FA12 lost |
2019-02-22 | Legislature | Chambers FA12 pending |
2019-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA12 pending |
2019-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA12 filed |
2019-02-20 | Legislature | Bolz AM365 lost |
2019-02-20 | Legislature | Bolz AM365 filed |
2019-02-20 | Legislature | Chambers FA11 lost |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers FA11 pending |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers FA11 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Bolz FA10 adopted |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Bolz FA10 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers FA9 adopted |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Chambers FA9 filed |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Education AM286 pending |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Education AM286 filed |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM286 |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2019 |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |