NE LB391 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer funds to the Customized Job Training Cash Fund
Title
Transfer funds to the Customized Job Training Cash Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB391 amended into LB380 by AM393 |
2021-02-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |