NE LB388A | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Approved by Governor on May 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Friesen AM1193 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Legislature - Friesen AM1193 adopted (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 26, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-05-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 |
2021-05-18 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-05-12 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER78 adopted |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER78 filed |
2021-05-04 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER78 |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Friesen AM1193 adopted |
2021-04-29 | Legislature | Friesen AM1193 filed |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-04-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |