NE LB386A | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor on April 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Approved by Governor on April 26, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriation Bill
Title
Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-1-2 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Legislature | Correction |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-1-2 |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-04-09 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |