NE LB384 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB588 amended into LB384 by AM396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Provisions/portions of LB588 amended into LB384 by AM396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for and change provisions related to transfers of funds and funding for university and state college facilities, create and change permitted uses of funds, and create a grant program
Title
Provide for and change provisions related to transfers of funds and funding for university and state college facilities, create and change permitted uses of funds, and create a grant program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Legislature - Wayne AM962 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Legislature - Stinner AM937 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM396 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Legislature - Wayne AM962 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Legislature - Stinner AM937 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Legislature - Appropriations AM396 adopted (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB588 amended into LB384 by AM396 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB465 amended into LB384 by AM396 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB279 amended into LB384 by AM396 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB142 amended into LB384 by AM396 |
2021-05-27 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB42 amended into LB384 by AM396 |
2021-04-26 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 26, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 41-0-8 |
2021-04-20 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2021-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST10 |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Wayne AM962 adopted |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Wayne AM962 filed |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Wayne AM939 withdrawn |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Stinner AM937 adopted |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Stinner AM937 filed |
2021-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER49 adopted |
2021-04-12 | Legislature | Wayne AM939 filed |
2021-04-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER49 filed |
2021-04-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER49 |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-04-08 | Legislature | Appropriations AM396 adopted |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | Appropriations AM396 filed |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM396 |
2021-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2021 |
2021-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |