NE LB384 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change certain education requirements under the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Title
Change certain education requirements under the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-15 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 31-10-8 (Y: 31 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM272 adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Legislature - Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM272 adopted (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | M. Hansen explanation of vote |
2019-03-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-15 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 31-10-8 |
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-03-07 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER39 adopted |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER39 filed |
2019-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER39 |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM272 adopted |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM272 filed |
2019-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM272 |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2019 |
2019-01-22 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2019-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |