NE LB382 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide powers and duties for University of Nebraska police departments and police officers
Title
Provide powers and duties for University of Nebraska police departments and police officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |