NE LB379 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Create the Willa Cather Historical Building Cash Fund and provide for grants for and change provisions relating to the Willa Cather historical buildings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create the Willa Cather Historical Building Cash Fund and provide for grants for and change provisions relating to the Willa Cather historical buildings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 04, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 29, 2018
2018-03-29LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-03-29LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 49-0-0
2018-03-20LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading
2018-03-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-03-15LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER119 adopted
2018-03-08LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER119 filed
2018-03-08LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER119
2018-03-06LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-06LegislatureAppropriations AM1452 adopted
2018-02-21LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2018-02-15LegislatureAppropriations AM1452 filed
2018-02-15LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1452
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-16LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 08, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback