NE LB378 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Approved by Governor on March 03, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Approved by Governor on March 03, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change requirements for voter approval of borrowing money for public improvements by a first-class city
Title
Change requirements for voter approval of borrowing money for public improvements by a first-class city
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 03, 2016 |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-02-17 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-02-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-02-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-02-03 | Legislature | Corrected Urban Affairs AM637 adopted |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-03-05 | Legislature | Corrected Urban Affairs AM637 filed |
2015-03-04 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM379 filed |
2015-03-04 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM379 |
2015-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2015 |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |