NE LB377 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB377 amended into LB360 by AM1194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB377 amended into LB360 by AM1194
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions and procedures relating to the disposition, care, custody, and costs associated with the impoundment of dogs or cats
Title
Change provisions and procedures relating to the disposition, care, custody, and costs associated with the impoundment of dogs or cats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB377 amended into LB360 by AM1194 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-04-08 | Legislature | Agriculture AM1149 filed |
2015-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1149 |
2015-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2015 |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |