NE LB376 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Donate property to the Northeast Community College Area
Title
Donate property to the Northeast Community College Area
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 43-0-6 |
2017-04-12 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-05 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-03-30 | Legislature | Executive Board AM159 adopted |
2017-03-06 | Legislature | Scheer priority bill |
2017-02-09 | Legislature | Executive Board AM159 filed |
2017-02-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM159 |
2017-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 01, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |