NE LB375 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Credit Union Act
Title
Change provisions of the Credit Union Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 12, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 08, 2017 |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2017-05-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2017-05-02 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-02-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |