NE LB371 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create and provide duties for the Nebraska Council for Educational Success
Title
Create and provide duties for the Nebraska Council for Educational Success
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Hansen MO194 withdrawn |
2016-03-01 | Legislature | Hansen MO194 Reconsider the vote on AM1268 filed |
2016-02-29 | Legislature | Education AM1268 lost |
2016-02-25 | Legislature | Education AM1268 pending |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Bolz priority bill |
2016-01-06 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Education AM1268 filed |
2015-04-22 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1268 |
2015-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |