NE LB369 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change property tax provisions relating to net book value
Title
Change property tax provisions relating to net book value
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 24, 2023 |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2023-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |