NE LB364 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Opportunity Scholarships Act and provide tax credits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Opportunity Scholarships Act and provide tax credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-12 - Legislature - Linehan MO125 failed (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Legislature - Hunt AM1051 lost (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - Legislature - Linehan MO55 failed (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, M. MO54 failed (Y: 7 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-20LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2022-01-12LegislatureHansen, M. AM1585 filed
2022-01-12LegislatureCavanaugh, J. AM1173 filed
2022-01-12LegislatureLinehan MO125 failed
2022-01-12LegislatureLinehan MO125 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed
2022-01-12LegislatureLinehan MO124 withdrawn
2022-01-12LegislatureLinehan MO124 Bracket until April 11, 2022 filed
2022-01-12LegislatureHunt MO123 pending
2022-01-12LegislatureHunt MO123 Recommit to Revenue Committee filed
2022-01-12LegislatureMorfeld AM1145 pending
2022-01-12LegislatureMorfeld AM1145 pending
2022-01-12LegislatureHunt AM1051 lost
2022-01-12LegislatureWayne AM1565 filed
2022-01-12LegislatureHunt MO118 withdrawn
2022-01-12LegislatureHunt MO118 Bracket until April 20, 2022 filed
2022-01-11LegislatureWayne AM1557 filed
2022-01-11LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO52 withdrawn
2022-01-11LegislatureHunt AM1051 pending
2022-01-11LegislatureRevenue AM762 pending
2022-01-06LegislatureLinehan priority bill
2022-01-05LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2021-04-28LegislatureMorfeld AM1145 filed
2021-04-28LegislatureLinehan MO55 failed
2021-04-28LegislatureLinehan MO55 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7 Section 10 filed
2021-04-28LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO52 pending
2021-04-28LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO54 failed
2021-04-28LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO54 pending
2021-04-28LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO54 Bracket until May 4, 2021 filed
2021-04-28LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO52 pending
2021-04-28LegislaturePahls MO53 withdrawn
2021-04-28LegislaturePahls MO53 Bracket until May 5, 2021 filed
2021-04-28LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO52 pending
2021-04-28LegislatureCavanaugh, M. MO52 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed
2021-04-28LegislatureWayne MO51 withdrawn
2021-04-28LegislatureWayne MO51 Bracket until May 1, 2021 filed
2021-04-28LegislatureHunt AM1051 pending
2021-04-28LegislatureRevenue AM762 pending
2021-04-21LegislatureHunt AM1051 filed
2021-03-25LegislatureRevenue AM762 filed
2021-03-25LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM762
2021-03-10LegislatureLinehan priority bill
2021-02-11LegislatureGroene name added
2021-02-09LegislatureAguilar name added
2021-01-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 28, 2021
2021-01-15LegislatureLinehan AM6 filed
2021-01-15LegislatureLinehan AM5 filed
2021-01-15LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2021-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=44311
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/Intro/LB364.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM762.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1051.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO54.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO52.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1145.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO53.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO51.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO55.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1557.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1565.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO118.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO123.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1173.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/AM1585.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO125.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/AM/MO124.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/SI/LB364.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB364_20210127-102849.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/CS/LB364.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/107/PDF/FN/LB364_20220107-083454.pdf
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6816
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=6819
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7448
Roll Callhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_votes.php?KeyID=7452

Bill Comments

feedback