NE LB363 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Enrollment and Review ER8 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to banking, finance, securities, consumer protection, dividends, and installment sales and loans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to banking, finance, securities, consumer protection, dividends, and installment sales and loans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER8 filed
2021-02-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER8
2021-02-16LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2021-01-27LegislaturePlaced on General File
2021-01-15LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 26, 2021
2021-01-15LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2021-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback