NE LB362 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require payment of unpaid wages for violations of the Nebraska Wage Payment and Collection Act
Title
Require payment of unpaid wages for violations of the Nebraska Wage Payment and Collection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37631 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB362.pdf |