NE LB360 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Surgical Technologist Registry Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Surgical Technologist Registry Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-01-30LegislatureHealth and Human Services AM1627 filed
2018-01-30LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1627
2018-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2017-02-03LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 16, 2017
2017-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2017 (cancel)
2017-01-24LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2017
2017-01-17LegislatureReferred to Health and Human Services Committee
2017-01-13LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback