NE LB359 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions regarding multicultural education as prescribed and provide powers for the State Board of Education
Title
Change provisions regarding multicultural education as prescribed and provide powers for the State Board of Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Education AM400 filed |
2021-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM400 |
2021-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |