NE LB359 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB359 amended into LB360 by AM1193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB359 amended into LB360 by AM1193
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change a fee collected from dog licensees
Title
Change a fee collected from dog licensees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB359 amended into LB360 by AM1193 |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2015-04-08 | Legislature | Agriculture AM1147 filed |
2015-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1147 |
2015-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2015 |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |