NE LB358 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change income eligibility provisions relating to the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Title
Change income eligibility provisions relating to the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM493 adopted |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM493 filed |
2017-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM493 |
2017-03-08 | Legislature | McCollister priority bill |
2017-02-03 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 16, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30813 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB358.pdf |