NE LB351 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Approved by Governor on April 7, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to quality scale ratings under the Step Up to Quality Child Care Act
Title
Change provisions relating to quality scale ratings under the Step Up to Quality Child Care Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Linehan [N] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Legislature - Vargas AM603 lost (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Legislature - Vargas AM603 lost (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 7, 2021 |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 1, 2021 |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2021-04-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 41-0-8 |
2021-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Vargas AM603 lost |
2021-03-22 | Legislature | Vargas AM603 filed |
2021-03-16 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2021-03-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2021-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |