NE LB349 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Notice of hearing for March 07, 2023
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change award limitations and appropriations intent language under the Business Innovation Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change award limitations and appropriations intent language under the Business Innovation Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 07, 2023
2023-01-17LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2023-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback