NE LB347 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to an income tax deduction for dividends received from certain corporations
Title
Change provisions relating to an income tax deduction for dividends received from certain corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-05 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2021-02-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2021 |
2021-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |