NE LB347 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB265 amended into LB347 by AM598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Provisions/portions of LB265 amended into LB347 by AM598
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expand the jurisdiction of the Inspector General to include juvenile justice services and allow access to certain records and information
Title
Expand the jurisdiction of the Inspector General to include juvenile justice services and allow access to certain records and information
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Krist [N] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB265 amended into LB347 by AM598 |
2015-05-28 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 27, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2015-05-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2015-05-13 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Krist AM1547 withdrawn |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Krist AM1490 adopted |
2015-05-12 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2015-05-05 | Legislature | Krist AM1547 filed |
2015-05-04 | Legislature | Krist AM1490 filed |
2015-04-14 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2015-04-13 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER63 adopted |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER63 filed |
2015-03-30 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER63 |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2015-03-24 | Legislature | Judiciary AM598 adopted |
2015-03-16 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Judiciary AM598 filed |
2015-03-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM598 |
2015-02-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 26, 2015 |
2015-01-23 | Legislature | Rereferred to Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-16 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2015-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |