NE LB344 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Provisions/portions of LB344 amended into LB727 by AM1152
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exclude certain delinquent taxes from qualifying for tax credit under the Nebraska Property Tax Incentive Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exclude certain delinquent taxes from qualifying for tax credit under the Nebraska Property Tax Incentive Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB344 amended into LB727 by AM1152
2023-06-01LegislatureIndefinitely Postponed
2023-03-16LegislaturePlaced on General File
2023-03-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for March 09, 2023
2023-01-17LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2023-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback