NE LB344 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Animal Health and Disease Control Act, eliminate and provide duties for the Department of Agriculture, eliminate various acts, terminate and transfer certain funds, create a fund, and provide penalties
Title
Adopt the Animal Health and Disease Control Act, eliminate and provide duties for the Department of Agriculture, eliminate various acts, terminate and transfer certain funds, create a fund, and provide penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Halloran AM2705 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Agriculture AM2486 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Legislature - Halloran AM2705 adopted (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Legislature - Agriculture AM2486 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Hilkemann explanation of vote |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 21, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST51 |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Halloran AM2705 adopted |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER181 adopted |
2020-03-05 | Legislature | Halloran AM2705 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER181 filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER181 |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Halloran AM2039 withdrawn |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2486 adopted |
2020-02-19 | Legislature | Agriculture AM2486 filed |
2020-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2486 |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Halloran priority bill |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Halloran AM2039 filed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |