NE LB344 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change moratorium exceptions for long-term care beds
Title
Change moratorium exceptions for long-term care beds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on May 07, 2013 |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Bolz explanation of vote |
2013-05-02 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on May 01, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2013-05-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2013-04-29 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2013-04-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2013-04-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-04-19 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM549 adopted |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Health and Human Services AM549 filed |
2013-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM549 |
2013-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 27, 2013 |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |