NE LB343 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit public contracts with companies that boycott Israel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit public contracts with companies that boycott Israel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO527 Bracket until June 2, 2023 filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO524 Bracket until June 1, 2023 filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO528 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO526 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO523 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO525 Indefinitely postpone filed
2023-03-30LegislatureHunt MO522 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6 Section 3(f) filed
2023-03-24LegislatureConrad AM942 filed
2023-02-16LegislaturePlaced on General File
2023-02-14LegislatureSlama priority bill
2023-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 10, 2023
2023-01-20LegislatureHardin name added
2023-01-17LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2023-01-12LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=50433
Texthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LB343.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/AM942.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO522.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO523.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO524.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO525.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO526.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO527.pdf
Amendmenthttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/AM/MO528.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/SI/LB343.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB343_20230209-071538.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/CS/LB343.pdf
Supplementhttps://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/FN/LB343_20240102-065728.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback