NE LB343 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the School Safety Rapid Response Option Act and authorize schools to allow employees to carry concealed handguns

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the School Safety Rapid Response Option Act and authorize schools to allow employees to carry concealed handguns

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-13LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2020-01-08LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2019-02-27LegislatureBrewer name added
2019-02-11LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 28, 2019
2019-01-30LegislatureErdman name added
2019-01-24LegislatureBriese name added
2019-01-18LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2019-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback