NE LB335 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize a 24/7 sobriety program permit for operating a motor vehicle as a condition of bail
Title
Authorize a 24/7 sobriety program permit for operating a motor vehicle as a condition of bail
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 13, 2019 |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37522 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB335.pdf |