NE LB334 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB334 amended into LB631 by AM3262
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adopt the Reentry Housing Network Act and provide a duty for the Department of Correctional Services and the Board of Parole

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopt the Reentry Housing Network Act and provide a duty for the Department of Correctional Services and the Board of Parole

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-25LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB334 amended into LB631 by AM3262
2024-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-01-31LegislatureHunt name added
2023-01-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 27, 2023
2023-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2023-01-11LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback